Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 391 m/e 03/1914
LNER (1924) 5391   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3616   02/06/1946
BR (Tmp) E3616   06/03/1948
BR 63616 m/e 31/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/103/1914
O4/724/08/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 03/1914 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 48 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 8/10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 03/1914
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 24/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 18/07/1942
CLK Colwick 03/09/1942
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
WFD Woodford Halse 10/08/1944
DON Doncaster 03/02/1946
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
40E Colwick 10/04/1960
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1066)
16/04/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1880)
19/02/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1758)
07/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1301)
06/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
17/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1263)
24/08/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3670)
04/09/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3656)
23/02/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3675)
06/03/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3661)
23/12/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22312)
07/03/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22300)
15/10/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22304)
23/08/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22305)
25/09/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/01/1921 16/04/1921 99 days General
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1922 02/09/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1923 02/02/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5391
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1926 19/02/1927 120 days General
Boiler number 1758 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1929 04/05/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 07/11/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1934 06/10/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 17/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1940 24/08/1940 15 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D)
 
Stratford Works 29/07/1943 04/09/1943 38 days General
Arrived at Stratford 2/6/43
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1946 23/02/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1948 06/03/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3616
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1950 23/12/1950 29 days General
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63616
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1951 09/06/1951 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/10/1952 08/11/1952 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/02/1953 07/03/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1955 15/10/1955 182 days General
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1956 04/02/1956 14 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/07/1958 23/08/1958 43 days General
Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1959 25/09/1959 9 days Unclassified
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1960 02/07/1960 29 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 391
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922.    
01/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5391
   
23/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1758 (Diagram 15)
   
06/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.    
24/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
18/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Arrived at Stratford 2/6/43
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3616    
14/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1948. Dep: 06/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3616
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63616
   
02/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951.    
25/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.    
07/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1956. Dep: 04/02/1956.    
12/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1959. Dep: 25/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
10/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
04/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1960. Dep: 02/07/1960.    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63616 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev