Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 392 m/e 03/1914
LNER (1924) 5392   17/05/1924
War Dept. 746   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 03/1914 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 746 and sent to the Middle East via Ellesmere Port, 17/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 03/1914
NWE New England 18/10/1928
MAR March 12/10/1935
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1097)
08/05/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
17/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1479)
13/10/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1378)
20/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1966)
20/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
25/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1103)
10/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3284)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3431)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/01/1920 08/05/1920 99 days General
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1922 23/09/1922 99 days General  
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 17/05/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1479 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5392
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1926 10/04/1926 57 days General  
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 13/10/1928 78 days General
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 20/12/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 20/05/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1935 25/05/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 10/04/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1939 23/09/1939 29 days General  
Gorton Works 10/09/1941 20/09/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 3431 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 746
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 392
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
31/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1920. Dep: 08/05/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922.    
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1479 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5392
   
13/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926.    
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 20/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939.    
10/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3431 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 746
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 746 from March (MAR)    

prev prev