Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 393 m/e 03/1914
LNER (1924) 5393   27/03/1926
LNER (1946) 3618   14/04/1946
BR 63618 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 03/1914 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 24/02/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 17/7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 03/1914
IMM Immingham 06/01/1924
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 23/11/1940
GOR Gorton 31/01/1943
THJ Thornton Junction 10/02/1943
ANN Annesley 02/10/1943
38A Colwick 08/10/1950
38B Annesley 30/09/1951
38A Colwick 24/02/1952
36A Doncaster 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 24/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   24/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 105)
14/05/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
28/04/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
24/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1332)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 117)
30/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3220)
03/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
12/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
05/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3383)
30/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
26/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3309)
26/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22189)
01/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22179)
14/04/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22170)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/04/1921 14/05/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1923 25/08/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 27/03/1926 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5393
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 28/04/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1930 01/03/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 24/09/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1937 30/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 03/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1942 12/12/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1944 11/03/1944 4 days Light Repair
Tender repair only
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1945 05/05/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 30/08/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1949 26/03/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63618
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1951 26/05/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1953 01/08/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1956 14/04/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1960 05/03/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 12/03/1960 19/03/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 393
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1921. Dep: 14/05/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923.    
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
19/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 27/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5393
   
24/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930.    
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1332 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
21/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
   
31/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
02/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender repair only
   
14/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3618    
09/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63618
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1953. Dep: 01/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22179 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
10/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960.    
12/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960.    
24/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63618 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev