Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1292 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5252 Week
» 34838 Month
» 408851 Year
» 1630416 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 393 m/e 03/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5393   27/03/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3618   14/04/1946
British Railways 63618 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 03/1914 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 24/02/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 17/7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 03/1914
IMM Immingham on 06/01/1924
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
GOR Gorton on 31/01/1943
THJ Thornton Junction on 10/02/1943
ANN Annesley on 02/10/1943
38A Colwick on 08/10/1950
38B Annesley on 30/09/1951
38A Colwick on 24/02/1952
36A Doncaster on 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 24/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN CAM Cambridge on 03/08/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 24/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 105)
14/05/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
28/04/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
24/09/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1332)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 117)
30/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3220)
03/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
12/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
05/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3383)
30/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
26/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3309)
26/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22189)
01/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22179)
14/04/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22170)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/04/1921 14/05/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1923 25/08/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 27/03/1926 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5393
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 28/04/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1930 01/03/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 24/09/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1937 30/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 03/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1942 12/12/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1944 11/03/1944 4 days Light Repair
Tender repair only
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1945 05/05/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 30/08/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1949 26/03/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63618
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1951 26/05/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22189 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1953 01/08/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1956 14/04/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1960 05/03/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 12/03/1960 19/03/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 393
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
31/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
02/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
14/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3618    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63618 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev