Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 732 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3875 Week
» 14045 Month
» 291841 Year
» 1176222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 394 m/e 04/1914
LNER (1924) 5394   14/03/1925
LNER (1946) 3619   16/06/1946
BR 63619 w/e 20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/104/1914
O117/03/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 04/1914
Withdrawal Mon 21/10/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 07/07/1922
KEA Keadby 06/01/1924
CLK Colwick 26/10/1927
ANN Annesley 03/11/1927
GOR Gorton 01/04/1945
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 03/03/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 17/01/1960
   Withdrawn 21/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   21/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 111)
13/05/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 156)
08/10/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
25/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1103)
27/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
10/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
06/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1112)
29/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
06/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1473)
17/03/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5030)
31/05/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5026)
20/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5027)
20/08/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
23/02/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28371)
20/02/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28358)
23/06/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28359)
01/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28316)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/03/1922 13/05/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1925 14/03/1925 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5394
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1927 08/10/1927 101 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1930 08/03/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 25/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1935 27/04/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 10/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1939 06/05/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1941 29/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 05/02/1943 06/03/1943 30 days General
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1944 21/10/1944 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/12/1944 17/03/1945 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5030 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1947 31/05/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1949 20/08/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63619
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1952 23/02/1952 31 days General
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1953 07/03/1953 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/03/1953 14/03/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/01/1954 20/02/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1954 16/03/1954 22 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/02/1955 15/03/1955 38 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 01/05/1956 23/06/1956 54 days General
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1958 01/11/1958 26 days General
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1961 10/06/1961 38 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 394
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
25/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
31/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5394
   
30/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.    
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
   
15/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.    
23/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 17/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5030 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3619    
03/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63619
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953.    
10/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953.    
20/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954.    
06/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955.    
01/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 01/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
04/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1961. Dep: 10/06/1961.    
21/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63619 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev