|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/03/1922 | 13/05/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 156 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1925 | 14/03/1925 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5394 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 101 days | General | Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 25/03/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1935 | 27/04/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1937 | 10/04/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1944 | 17/03/1945 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5030 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63619 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1954 | 16/03/1954 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1955 | 15/03/1955 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1958 | 01/11/1958 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1961 | 10/06/1961 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 394 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
25/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 156 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/07/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
31/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5394 |
||
30/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. | ||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
23/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5030 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3619 | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5027 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63619 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
24/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. | ||
10/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. | ||
20/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954. | ||
06/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955. | ||
01/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 01/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
04/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1961. Dep: 10/06/1961. | ||
21/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63619 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |