Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 405 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6768 Week
» 9350 Month
» 273983 Year
» 1495548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 395 m/e 04/1914
LNER (1924) 5395   04/07/1925
LNER (1946) 3620   01/09/1946
BR 63620 w/e 04/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 04/1914
Withdrawal Mon 23/02/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 28/2/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1914
GOR Gorton 10/08/1917
IMM Immingham 06/01/1924
GOR Gorton 30/08/1940
YK York (North) 16/09/1940
HTN Heaton 28/03/1943
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
CUD Cudworth 07/11/1948
53A Hull Dairycoates 01/01/1951
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 02/09/1951
40B Immingham 16/09/1951
39B Sheffield Darnall 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn 23/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CUD Cudworth w/e 13/11/1948
WDN MAR March 12/05/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/01/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   23/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 139)
20/01/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1459)
14/01/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1514)
29/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1405)
18/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
29/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1052)
19/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3288)
31/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3293)
01/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 945)
01/02/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3401)
04/03/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
13/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22882)
17/09/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22239)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/09/1922 20/01/1923 120 days General
Boiler number 1459 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1925 04/07/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5395
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 14/01/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1514 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1930 05/04/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 22/10/1932 29/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 18/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1937 29/05/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1939 19/08/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1942 31/01/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1944 01/04/1944 16 days General
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 01/02/1947 15 days General
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1950 04/03/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63620
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1952 13/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1953 14/03/1953 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/08/1955 17/09/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22239 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 395
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
10/08/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1922. Dep: 20/01/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1459 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5395
   
10/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1514 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930.    
22/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
   
30/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
09/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
17/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3620    
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
   
07/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
18/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63620
   
01/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
16/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953.    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22239 (Diagram 15)
   
23/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63620 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev