|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/11/1922 | 17/02/1923 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1924 | 31/05/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5396 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1925 | 17/10/1925 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1928 | 10/03/1928 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1930 | 22/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1932 | 20/02/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1934 | 07/07/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1938 | 19/11/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1940 | 05/10/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 18 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1947 | 20/09/1947 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63621 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1955 | 05/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1958 | 05/04/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1960 | 03/12/1960 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 396 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
14/05/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
12/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5396 |
||
15/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925. | ||
12/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930. | ||
06/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1932. Dep: 20/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
28/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. | ||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
20/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3621 | ||
06/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63621 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
17/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
05/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 05/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960. | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63621 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |