Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 396 m/e 05/1914
LNER (1924) 5396   31/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3621   20/11/1946
BR 63621 w/e 13/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 05/1914
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 48 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 14/05/1920
KEA Keadby 06/01/1924
DON Doncaster 12/03/1927
MEX Mexborough 25/07/1943
DON Doncaster 18/08/1946
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
40E Langwith Junction 15/03/1953
40B Immingham 07/06/1953
39B Sheffield Darnall 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 03/10/1953
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 145)
17/02/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1636)
10/03/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
20/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
07/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1947)
08/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1262)
19/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1053)
19/11/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
05/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1284)
28/04/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
20/09/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1299)
13/05/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3228)
31/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22148)
05/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22292)
05/04/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22257)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/11/1922 17/02/1923 92 days General
Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 31/05/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5396
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1925 17/10/1925 64 days General  
Gorton Works 18/02/1928 10/03/1928 22 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1930 22/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 06/02/1932 20/02/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1934 07/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 08/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1938 19/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1940 05/10/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1943 27/02/1943 18 days General  
Gorton Works 14/04/1945 28/04/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1947 20/09/1947 15 days General
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1950 13/05/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63621
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1952 31/05/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1955 05/03/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1958 05/04/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1960 03/12/1960 22 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 396
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/05/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1636 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5396
   
15/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925.    
12/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
   
15/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930.    
06/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1932. Dep: 20/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
23/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
28/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943.    
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3621    
06/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63621
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15)
   
08/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 05/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960.    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63621 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev