Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 397 m/e 05/1914
LNER (1924) 5397   07/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3622   27/10/1946
BR 63622 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 05/1914
Withdrawal Wed 01/05/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 49 yrs , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 5/6/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 11/05/1917
ARD Ardsley 11/08/1926
DON Doncaster 07/09/1928
NWE New England 19/10/1933
DON Doncaster 08/11/1934
MEX Mexborough 04/08/1940
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
41G Barnsley 29/11/1959
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
41J Langwith Junction 03/09/1961
   Withdrawn 01/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 41G Barnsley 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   01/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 154)
16/05/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1528)
07/02/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
17/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
13/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 514)
22/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
15/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3207)
17/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
27/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1267)
12/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
02/10/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3337)
30/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22194)
16/01/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22203)
29/09/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22204)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/02/1922 16/05/1922 95 days General
Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 07/02/1924 83 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5397
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1925 06/04/1925 47 days General  
Gorton Works 29/06/1928 23/08/1928 56 days General  
Gorton Works 19/05/1930 17/07/1930 60 days General
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1932 13/08/1932 39 days General
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1935 22/11/1935 46 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1937 15/01/1938 32 days General
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1940 17/02/1940 41 days General
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1943 27/02/1943 44 days General
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1945 12/01/1946 54 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1948 02/10/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63622
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1951 30/06/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1951 18/07/1951 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/12/1953 16/01/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1954 23/01/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/08/1956 29/09/1956 46 days General
Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1958 17/05/1958 39 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/04/1960 28/05/1960 33 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 397
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/05/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1922. Dep: 16/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 07/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5397
   
19/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1925. Dep: 06/04/1925.    
11/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
29/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1928. Dep: 23/08/1928.    
07/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1930. Dep: 17/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
08/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 22/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
   
15/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1937. Dep: 15/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3622    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63622
   
30/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
   
05/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 18/07/1951.    
14/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22203 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 23/01/1954.    
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
15/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22204 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958.    
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (41G)    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
26/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1960. Dep: 28/05/1960.    
03/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63622 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev