Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 398 m/e 05/1914
LNER (1924) 5398   09/05/1925
LNER (1946) 3623   08/12/1946
BR 63623 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 05/1914 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Fri 09/02/1962 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/3/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 05/1914
ARD Ardsley 11/08/1926
DON Doncaster 30/06/1928
MEX Mexborough 10/07/1928
MAR March 17/11/1933
CLK Colwick 03/01/1934
LNG Langwith Junction 21/02/1934
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 27/11/1949
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
   Withdrawn 09/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   09/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 156)
16/04/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
16/04/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1877)
09/06/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1283)
04/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1269)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3203)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1355)
25/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3397)
11/07/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
17/06/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1236)
18/05/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1025)
03/07/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3298)
17/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22163)
16/01/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22212)
30/03/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22150)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/03/1921 16/04/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1923 14/04/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 09/05/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5398
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1928 09/06/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1930 07/06/1930 22 days General  
Gorton Works 21/01/1933 04/02/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1937 07/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1940 25/05/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1942 11/07/1942 15 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1944 17/06/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 08/09/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/05/1946 18/05/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1948 03/07/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63623
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1951 17/02/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1953 16/01/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1957 30/03/1957 22 days General
Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 398
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
03/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923.    
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5398
   
11/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
28/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 09/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930.    
21/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
03/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
   
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.    
04/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3623    
19/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63623
   
27/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
03/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
   
26/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15)
   
09/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63623 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev