|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/03/1921 | 16/04/1921 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 09/05/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5398 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1928 | 09/06/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1930 | 07/06/1930 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1933 | 04/02/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1935 | 17/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1948 | 03/07/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63623 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1951 | 17/02/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 398 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
19/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1877 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
03/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. | ||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5398 |
||
11/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 09/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
10/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. | ||
21/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
03/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. | ||
04/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3623 | ||
19/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63623 |
||
27/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
03/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63623 from Mexborough (41F) |