Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 399 m/e 06/1914
LNER (1924) 5399   21/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3624   13/12/1946
BR 63624 w/e 02/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/106/1914
O4/814/05/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 06/1914
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 48 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 01/12/1916
MEX Mexborough 13/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 11/08/1926
DON Doncaster 09/10/1928
MAR March 24/08/1933
CLK Colwick 30/01/1936
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
FRO Frodingham 02/12/1945
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
DON Doncaster 20/10/1947
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
40E Langwith Junction 15/03/1953
40B Immingham 07/06/1953
39B Sheffield Darnall 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 175)
12/05/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1745)
21/11/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1047)
06/10/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1405)
13/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1085)
14/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3207)
31/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3310)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3315)
26/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3236)
24/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3250)
06/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
20/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22295)
14/05/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28880)
10/01/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28307)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/01/1921 26/02/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 10/03/1923 12/05/1923 64 days General
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1925 21/11/1925 78 days General
Boiler number 1047 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5399
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 06/10/1928 57 days General
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1930 26/07/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 13/08/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1935 14/09/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1937 31/12/1937 14 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1940 08/06/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 15/05/1943 26/06/1943 43 days General
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1945 24/03/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1947 06/12/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1950 26/08/1950 15 days General
Renumbered to BR 63624
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1951 10/11/1951 12 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1952 20/09/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22295 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1955 14/05/1955 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1956 15/12/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/12/1958 10/01/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 5039 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 399
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/12/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
08/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1921. Dep: 26/02/1921.    
10/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
   
13/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1047 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5399
   
11/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 15)
   
09/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930.    
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
   
25/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
   
15/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3624    
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63624
   
30/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
30/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22295 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
19/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28880 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.    
06/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1958. Dep: 10/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5039 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63624 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev