Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1154 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1154 Week
» 3736 Month
» 268369 Year
» 1489934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 271 m/e 08/1914
LNER (1924) 5271   01/03/1924
War Dept. 756   05/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 435
To Service During 08/1914
Withdrawal Sun 05/10/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 27 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 756 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1914
ANN Annesley 02/11/1918
STV Staveley (G.C.) 02/02/1923
ARD Ardsley 12/08/1926
MEX Mexborough 09/01/1928
   Withdrawn 05/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1914 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 179)
26/03/1921 Ross Pop
26/03/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
17/12/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1952)
08/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1089)
21/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1085)
19/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3354)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3270)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/02/1921 26/03/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1923 01/03/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5271
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 17/12/1927 43 days General
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1930 08/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 01/10/1932 08/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 21/09/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1938 19/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3354 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1941 27/09/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1914 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 271
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/11/1918 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 26/03/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop
   
02/02/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
15/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5271
   
12/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
01/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.    
01/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3354 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 756 from Mexborough (MEX)    
05/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 756    

prev prev