|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/07/1927 | 22/10/1927 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1932 | 09/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1945 | 24/03/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63735 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1951 | 24/03/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22169 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1951 | 02/04/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1953 | 22/06/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1957 | 27/01/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1957 | 01/02/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1960 | 02/04/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1805 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21772 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/01/1927 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6562 | ||
23/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927. | ||
25/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/10/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. | ||
26/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
15/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
21/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3735 | ||
30/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63735 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22169 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 02/04/1951. | ||
09/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
30/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
23/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1953. Dep: 22/06/1953. | ||
27/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
03/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 27/01/1957. | ||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 01/02/1957. | ||
05/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63735 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |