Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 736 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6545 Week
» 13729 Month
» 321710 Year
» 1206091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1805 m/e 09/1917
LNER (1924) 6562   22/01/1927
LNER (1946) 3735   01/09/1946
BR 63735 w/e 25/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21772
To Service During 09/1917
Taken into Stock 25/10/1927
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 20/9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 25/10/1927
IMM Immingham 22/09/1933
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 21/01/1943
GOR Gorton 10/03/1943
ANN Annesley 01/04/1945
WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 11/09/1949
31B March 09/03/1952
38A Colwick 30/03/1952
38D Staveley (G.C.) 27/12/1953
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1241)
09/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1058)
29/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
04/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1867)
10/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1432)
14/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3254)
24/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3380)
11/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
24/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3217)
24/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22169)
13/06/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22175)
01/10/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22118)
02/04/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22890)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/07/1927 22/10/1927 92 days General  
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 12/04/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 26/03/1932 09/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1935 29/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1937 04/09/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 10/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1943 14/08/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1945 24/03/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3380 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1946 11/01/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1948 24/12/1948 14 days General
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63735
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22169 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1951 02/04/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/05/1953 13/06/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1953 22/06/1953 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/09/1955 01/10/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1956 01/09/1956 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/01/1957 27/01/1957 17 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/01/1957 01/02/1957 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/03/1960 02/04/1960 29 days General
Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1805
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21772
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/01/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6562    
23/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927.    
25/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/10/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.    
26/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
15/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
21/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3380 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3735    
30/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63735
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22169 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 02/04/1951.    
09/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1953. Dep: 22/06/1953.    
27/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
03/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956.    
11/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 27/01/1957.    
29/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 01/02/1957.    
05/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63735 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev