Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1806 m/e 09/1917
LNWR 2921 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6563   18/02/1928
War Dept. 783   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21773
To Service During 09/1917
Taken into Stock 17/02/1928
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 783 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
DON Doncaster 17/02/1928
IMM Immingham 22/09/1933
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1272)
09/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1001)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3301)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3346)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 18/02/1928 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6563
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 12/04/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 19/12/1931 09/01/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1001 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1937 07/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1939 21/10/1939 15 days General  
Gorton Works 30/09/1941 11/10/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 3346 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1806
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21773
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2921    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6563
   
17/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/02/1928 To Stock To LNWR stock    
15/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.    
19/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 09/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1001 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
   
07/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939.    
30/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3346 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 783 from Immingham (IMM)    
18/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 783    

prev prev