|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1924 | 23/02/1924 | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6285 |
|||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1926 | 18/06/1926 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1928 | 01/10/1928 | 41 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1930 | 25/03/1930 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1931 | 16/01/1932 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 34 days | General | Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1936 | 02/04/1936 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1939 | 22/10/1939 | 101 days | General | Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1941 | 17/01/1942 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1944 | 01/06/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 31 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1948 | 21/03/1948 | 38 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63739 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1948 | 12/02/1949 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1949 | 07/12/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22166 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1951 | 08/03/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 65 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1962 | 09/02/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1811 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21778 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6285 |
||
07/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
07/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
24/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
31/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1928. Dep: 01/10/1928. | ||
24/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1930. Dep: 25/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1931. Dep: 16/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. Work undertaken: Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1936. Dep: 02/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1116 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1939. Dep: 22/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1944. Dep: 01/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3739 | ||
07/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
13/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 21/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63739 |
||
22/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1948. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. | ||
06/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 07/12/1949. | ||
20/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
24/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22166 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 08/03/1951. | ||
14/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
14/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. | ||
05/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1962. Dep: 09/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63739 from Langwith Junction (41J) |