Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1815 m/e 10/1917
LNWR 2962 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6567   25/10/1928
LNER (1946) 3741   18/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E3741   13/02/1948
BR 63741 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O4/805/07/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21782
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 25/10/1928
Withdrawal Sun 04/04/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 47 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
GOR Gorton 25/10/1928
MEX Mexborough 27/01/1946
DON Doncaster 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
36C Frodingham 10/09/1950
   Withdrawn 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 10/09/1950
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
19/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1027)
01/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1314)
16/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 855)
08/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
07/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
01/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3351)
17/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3224)
05/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3333)
13/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1284)
02/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22138)
13/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22884)
04/06/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22273)
05/07/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28969)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1928 25/10/1928 111 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6567
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 19/01/1931 52 days General
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1933 01/04/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1935 16/03/1935 27 days General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 08/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1938 07/01/1939 41 days General
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1941 01/02/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1941 13/09/1941 2 days Special
Examined for WD
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1943 17/04/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1945 05/01/1946 56 days General
Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1948 13/02/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3741
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1949 05/11/1949 19 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 63741
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1949 11/11/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/11/1950 02/12/1950 31 days General
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1950 09/12/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/11/1952 13/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22884 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1955 04/06/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1958 05/07/1958 51 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28969 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1961 24/06/1961 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 28/03/1962 07/04/1962 11 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1815
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21782
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2962    
07/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1928. Dep: 25/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6567
   
25/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/10/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 19/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
   
25/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Special) - Arr: 12/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Examined for WD
   
11/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3741    
04/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3741
   
18/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63741
   
09/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949.    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
02/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950.    
22/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22884 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28969 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 24/06/1961.    
28/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1962. Dep: 07/04/1962.    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
04/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63741 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev