Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1817 m/e 10/1917
LNER (1924) 6569   04/06/1927
War Dept. 742   21/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21784
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 03/06/1927
Withdrawal Sun 21/09/1941 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 742 and sent to the Middle East via Bidston 15/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 03/06/1927
KEA Keadby 07/01/1931
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
   Withdrawn 21/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1050)
18/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
20/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1473)
04/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
10/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3220)
09/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1007)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/03/1927 04/06/1927 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6569
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 29/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 11/02/1933 18/02/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1935 20/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1937 04/09/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1938 02/07/1938 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 10/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1941 09/08/1941 6 days Heavy
Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1941 20/09/1941 11 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1817
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21784
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6569
   
03/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/06/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
22/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930.    
07/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1473 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3220 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.    
21/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 742 from Frodingham (FRO)    
21/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 742    

prev prev