Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 393 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 13386 Month
» 321367 Year
» 1205748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1819 m/e 10/1917
LNER (1924) 6284   22/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3744   13/10/1946
BR 63744 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21786
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/07/1963 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 26/7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/03/1924
DON Doncaster 20/12/1924
CAM Cambridge 11/08/1932
DON Doncaster 28/08/1932
FRO Frodingham 25/07/1943
   Withdrawn 19/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   19/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1331)
22/03/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
14/10/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1172)
06/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 817)
23/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1855)
23/06/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3237)
11/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
21/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3256)
24/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3430)
23/02/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3343)
17/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3305)
09/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22140)
17/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22892)
02/09/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22107)
17/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22207)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 22/03/1924 8 days Light Repair
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6284
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1924 11/12/1924 151 days General  
Gorton Works 27/05/1927 08/07/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1929 14/10/1929 105 days General
Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1931 06/10/1931 44 days General
Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1934 23/06/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 23/05/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1938 11/05/1938 39 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1940 21/09/1940 20 days General
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1942 24/12/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1945 23/02/1946 56 days General
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1948 17/05/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63744
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1948 05/06/1948 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/11/1950 09/12/1950 28 days General
Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1950 14/12/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/12/1952 17/01/1953 34 days General
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1953 22/02/1953 31 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/07/1955 02/09/1955 35 days General
Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1958 17/05/1958 30 days General
Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1960 22/11/1960 41 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 06/09/1961 03/10/1961 28 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1819
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21786
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6284
   
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1924. Dep: 11/12/1924.    
20/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1927. Dep: 08/07/1927.    
02/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1929. Dep: 14/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1931. Dep: 06/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 817 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
28/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1938. Dep: 11/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
30/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1945. Dep: 23/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3744    
04/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1948. Dep: 17/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63744
   
24/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.    
12/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15)
   
13/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 14/12/1950.    
15/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 22/02/1953.    
30/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22207 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1960. Dep: 22/11/1960.    
06/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1961. Dep: 03/10/1961.    
19/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63744 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev