Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1824 m/e 11/1917
LNER (1924) 6572   14/05/1927
LNER (1946) 3747   19/07/1946
BR 63747 w/e 10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1917
O4/718/07/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21791
To Service During 11/1917
Taken into Stock 12/05/1927
Withdrawal Thu 18/05/1961 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley 12/05/1927
IMM Immingham 10/09/1927
KEA Keadby 27/02/1930
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 08/09/1946
FRO Frodingham 25/12/1949
   Withdrawn 18/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 31/12/1949
WDN   18/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1015)
05/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1864)
23/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
14/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3224)
28/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3206)
18/07/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3683)
02/09/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3684)
26/07/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3660)
09/09/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22300)
01/11/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22301)
21/05/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22310)
29/03/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22873)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/02/1927 14/05/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6572
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 02/11/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 05/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 23/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 14/12/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 28/05/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1939 25/11/1939 15 days General  
Stratford Works 13/06/1942 18/07/1942 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1944 02/09/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1945 19/05/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/06/1947 26/07/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1948 10/04/1948 22 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63747
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1950 09/09/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1950 28/09/1950 13 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1952 07/11/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/04/1955 21/05/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1958 29/03/1958 22 days General
Boiler number 22873 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1961 06/05/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1824
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21791
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6572
   
12/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/05/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
10/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.    
27/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.    
13/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1942. Dep: 18/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
   
19/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3747    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63747
   
25/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
19/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 28/09/1950.    
18/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
   
04/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952.    
23/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
   
08/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22873 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/05/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961.    
18/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63747 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev