Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 325 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 325 Week
» 7509 Month
» 315490 Year
» 1199871 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1827 m/e 11/1917
LNWR 2926 m/e 12/1919
GCR 1258c   12/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6258   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3748   11/08/1946
BR 63748 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1917
O4/704/05/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21794
To Service During 11/1917
Taken into Stock 12/01/1924
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 45 yrs , 19 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 12/01/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 23/05/1924
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 23/07/1942
ANN Annesley 07/05/1944
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
39B Sheffield Darnall 13/06/1954
36C Frodingham 13/09/1959
   Withdrawn 19/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   25/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1158)
17/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
13/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1162)
18/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
29/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
24/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
04/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3666)
07/10/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3682)
01/03/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3663)
28/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3694)
28/10/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22306)
06/12/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22871)
11/06/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22349)
06/12/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22304)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/12/1923 12/01/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1258c
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 17/05/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6258
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1926 11/12/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 19/01/1929 16/02/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 13/12/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1933 18/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1935 29/06/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 24/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1940 04/05/1940 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1942 03/10/1942 18 days General  
Gorton Works 03/10/1944 07/10/1944 5 days General
Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 23/02/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/02/1947 01/03/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1948 28/08/1948 15 days Heavy
Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63748
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1949 26/03/1949 15 days General  
Gorton Works 14/10/1950 28/10/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1950 07/11/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/01/1952 02/02/1952 15 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1952 06/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1954 20/02/1954 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/05/1955 11/06/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1955 23/06/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/11/1958 06/12/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1827
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21794
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2926    
08/1921 Allocation      
29/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1258c
   
12/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6258
   
23/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
09/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926.    
19/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 16/02/1929.    
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
   
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
23/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
16/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.    
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15)
   
16/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946.    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3748    
08/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63748
   
12/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949.    
14/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 07/11/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
19/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
15/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
07/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1955. Dep: 23/06/1955.    
08/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 06/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
   
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
19/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63748 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev