Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1831 m/e 11/1917
GCR 1278c   12/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6278   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3750   03/08/1946
BR 63750 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1917
O4/804/10/1952
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21798
To Service During 11/1917
Taken into Stock 09/01/1924
Withdrawal Mon 09/03/1964 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Albert Looms (Spondon)
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Albert Looms, Spondon, 5/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 09/01/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 03/03/1927
WFD Woodford Halse 07/04/1927
IMM Immingham 14/09/1929
KEA Keadby 27/09/1929
IMM Immingham 29/06/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 09/01/1944
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 28/03/1948
MEX Mexborough 16/01/1949
DON Doncaster 07/08/1949
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
40B Immingham 24/07/1955
40E Colwick 10/04/1960
   Withdrawn 09/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   09/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
17/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1209)
23/05/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
14/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1042)
20/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 512)
25/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1075)
20/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1291)
19/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3410)
21/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
10/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
24/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3318)
28/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3210)
04/10/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28831)
27/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28323)
06/07/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28389)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/12/1923 12/01/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1278c
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1924 17/05/1924 53 days General
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6278
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1926 23/02/1927 55 days General  
Gorton Works 07/02/1929 23/05/1929 106 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1931 14/07/1931 60 days General
Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1933 20/01/1934 32 days General
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 25/07/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1938 20/08/1938 50 days General
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1940 19/10/1940 33 days General
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1942 21/11/1942 35 days General
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1945 10/03/1945 37 days General
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1947 24/12/1947 30 days General
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1948 08/01/1948 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/12/1949 28/01/1950 42 days General
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63750
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1952 04/10/1952 65 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1952 10/10/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/10/1954 27/11/1954 40 days General
Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1957 06/07/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1958 13/12/1958 20 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/02/1960 22/03/1960 34 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 29/09/1960 14/10/1960 16 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/04/1961 14/04/1961 10 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/06/1961 07/07/1961 29 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1831
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21798
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1278c
   
09/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/01/1924 To Stock To ROD stock    
26/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6278
   
31/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1926. Dep: 23/02/1927.    
03/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1929. Dep: 23/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
16/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 14/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
02/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
02/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3750    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
25/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 08/01/1948.    
28/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
16/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63750
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
01/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 10/10/1952.    
19/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958.    
18/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 22/03/1960.    
10/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
29/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1960. Dep: 14/10/1960.    
05/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1961. Dep: 14/04/1961.    
09/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1961. Dep: 07/07/1961.    
09/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63750 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev