Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 616 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8955 Week
» 6063 Month
» 113009 Year
» 1334574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1833 m/e 12/1917
LNER (1924) 6574   17/09/1927
LNER (1946) 3751   12/10/1946
BR 63751 w/e 05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21800
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 16/09/1927
Withdrawal Thu 12/03/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 16/09/1927
GOR Gorton 30/08/1940
YK York (North) 11/09/1940
HTN Heaton 28/03/1943
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
CUD Cudworth 07/11/1948
20C Royston 12/08/1951
38A Colwick 02/09/1951
38B Annesley 18/10/1953
38A Colwick 27/12/1953
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 12/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CUD Cudworth w/e 13/11/1948
LOAN 20C Royston w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 20C Royston 12/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   12/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1185)
20/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
23/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
10/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3299)
07/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
22/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3294)
28/10/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3392)
12/10/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
05/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
17/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22891)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/06/1927 17/09/1927 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6574
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1929 11/01/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 13/08/1932 20/08/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1935 23/03/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 10/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1939 07/10/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1942 22/08/1942 20 days General
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1944 28/10/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1946 12/10/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3751
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1947 22/11/1947 8 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 15/01/1949 05/02/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63751
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1952 31/05/1952 22 days General  
Gorton Works 19/02/1955 17/03/1955 27 days General
Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1955 20/03/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/02/1957 02/03/1957 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/03/1957 07/03/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/03/1959 09/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1833
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21800
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6574
   
16/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/09/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
30/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930.    
13/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
   
09/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
   
30/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
03/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
14/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
21/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3751
   
15/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947.    
07/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
15/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 05/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63751
   
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
10/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952.    
18/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
27/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15)
   
19/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 20/03/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
23/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957.    
05/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 07/03/1957.    
09/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 09/03/1959.    
12/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63751 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev