|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/02/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6575 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1929 | 03/08/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1931 | 18/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1935 | 20/07/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1939 | 16/12/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1945 | 29/04/1945 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 02/1946 | Light Repair | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1948 | 30/01/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3752 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 3 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63752 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1949 | 23/03/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1954 | 03/02/1955 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1957 | 28/02/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1958 | 24/01/1959 | 45 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1961 | 18/05/1961 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1961 | 02/12/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Belle Vue MPD | 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. | SLS/194601 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1834 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21801 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6575 |
||
19/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/04/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
06/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. | ||
27/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
09/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
19/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1945. Dep: 29/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
13/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3752 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3752 |
||
20/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
07/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63752 |
||
14/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1949. Dep: 23/03/1949. | ||
03/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
06/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. | ||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 03/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1957. Dep: 28/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959. | ||
12/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/04/1961. Dep: 18/05/1961. | ||
07/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63752 from Annesley (16D) |