|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/02/1928 | 21/04/1928 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6576 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1933 | 29/04/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1934 | 26/05/1934 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1943 | 13/03/1943 | 18 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1947 | 01/11/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1950 | 11/03/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63753 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22296 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1952 | 02/10/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1957 | 01/06/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1959 | 28/11/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1836 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21803 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2931 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
25/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6576 |
||
21/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/04/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
13/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
04/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. | ||
15/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934. | ||
25/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3753 | ||
11/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
25/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1950. Dep: 11/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63753 |
||
15/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
13/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22296 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 02/10/1952. | ||
21/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
08/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. | ||
25/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957. | ||
28/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/11/1959. Dep: 28/11/1959. | ||
02/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63753 from Mexborough (41F) |