Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1840 m/e 12/1917
LNWR 2966 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6578   21/01/1928
LNER (1946) 3755   06/07/1946
BR 63755 w/e 27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/312/1917
O121/10/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L689
Works Number 21807
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 21/01/1928
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 3/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
HLD Hull Dairycoates 21/01/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 18/11/1929
CUD Cudworth 07/02/1930
HLS Hull Springhead 08/01/1940
WHL West Hartlepool 18/05/1940
HLS Hull Springhead 09/02/1945
TDK Tyne Dock 15/06/1946
DAR Darlington 06/02/1949
HLD Hull Dairycoates 11/09/1949
53C Hull Springhead 05/02/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1308)
29/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
01/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1302)
09/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1200)
29/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1271)
21/10/1941 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5008)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3319)
06/07/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5084)
27/08/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
27/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5014)
28/04/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28314)
05/07/1952 Westinghouse Brake fitted
05/07/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28382)
05/07/1952 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/02/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28365)
05/10/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28335)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/12/1927 21/01/1928 22 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6578
 
Darlington Works 28/04/1930 29/07/1930 93 days General  
Gorton Works 22/04/1933 29/04/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1935 01/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1937 09/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1940 29/06/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1942 10/10/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1944 21/10/1944 64 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1946 06/07/1946 45 days General
Boiler number 5084 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3755
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1949 27/08/1949 37 days General
Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63755
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1951 28/04/1951 40 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1952 05/07/1952 30 days General
Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic
Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A)
Vacuum Ejector fitted
 
Gateshead Works 07/05/1954 24/05/1954 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/11/1955 12/02/1956 79 days General  
Gorton Works 25/07/1957 05/10/1957 73 days General
Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1958 31/05/1958 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/02/1960 09/04/1960 46 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1840
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21807
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2966    
31/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6578
   
21/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/01/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
28/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1930. Dep: 29/07/1930.    
22/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
   
25/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
18/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1941 Modification Diagram 100A number 5008 boiler fitted    
28/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
   
09/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
23/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5084 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3755
   
15/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
22/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63755
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
06/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic
Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A)
Vacuum Ejector fitted
   
07/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1954. Dep: 24/05/1954.    
12/02/1955 Modification Diagram 100A number 28365 boiler fitted    
26/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 12/02/1956.    
25/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958.    
24/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/02/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960.    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63755 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev