Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 542 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3187 Week
» 5769 Month
» 270402 Year
» 1491967 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1651 m/e 09/1917
LNWR 2903 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6356   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3670   08/09/1946
BR 63670 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/309/1917
O116/03/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3695
To Service During 09/1917
Taken into Stock 19/01/1924
Withdrawal Thu 04/06/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh, 8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1917
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 19/01/1924
DON Doncaster 02/04/1924
CLK Colwick 23/04/1931
ANN Annesley 15/05/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 23/05/1938
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 10/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 21/02/1960
   Withdrawn 04/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/03/1960
WDN   04/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1159)
19/01/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 179)
18/04/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1288)
09/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1871)
14/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1010)
14/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3328)
06/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3402)
24/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3399)
16/03/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5052)
04/1946 Drop Grate fitted
29/11/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5040)
27/05/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5032)
21/06/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28830)
29/05/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28828)
30/06/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28289)
20/09/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28973)
18/02/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28853)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1961 Swindon Works (Works Sidings) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/01/1924 15/03/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6356
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1926 10/07/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1928 19/01/1929 99 days General
Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1931 18/04/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 09/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 14/03/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1938 30/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1940 06/07/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 19/11/1942 24/12/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1945 16/03/1946 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 1946 04/1946   Light Repair
Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1947 29/11/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1948 04/09/1948 1 day Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63670
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1949 22/01/1949 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 10/12/1949 10/12/1949 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/05/1950 27/05/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1952 21/06/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1954 29/05/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1955 04/06/1955 22 days General  
Gorton Works 02/06/1956 30/06/1956 29 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1958 20/09/1958 43 days General
Boiler number 28973 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1961 18/02/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1651
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3695
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2903    
08/1921 Allocation      
12/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6356
   
19/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/01/1924 To Stock To LNWR stock    
02/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926.    
13/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15)
   
23/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
09/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 16/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
   
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 00/00/1946. Dep: 00/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3670    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63670
   
22/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949.    
10/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949.    
13/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
31/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955.    
02/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1956. Dep: 30/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28973 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
14/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63670 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev