Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1652 m/e 09/1917
LNWR 2904 m/e 12/1919
GCR 1355c   05/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6355   16/08/1924
War Dept. 720   09/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3696
To Service During 09/1917
Taken into Stock 05/01/1924
Withdrawal Tue 09/09/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 24 yrs , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 720 and sent to Middle East via Birkenhead, 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 05/01/1924
LNG Langwith Junction m/e 1927
MAR March 02/03/1929
   Withdrawn 09/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1147)
16/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
08/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1866)
23/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1075)
14/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1113)
03/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
08/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3364)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 05/01/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1355c
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 16/08/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6355
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 17/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 08/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1932 23/04/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 14/07/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1936 03/10/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1939 08/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3364 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1941 22/03/1941 22 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1652
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3696
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2904    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1355c
   
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6355
   
1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927.    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
   
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3364 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.    
09/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 720 from March (MAR)    
09/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 720    

prev prev