Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1653 m/e 10/1917
LNWR 2905 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6354   14/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3672   03/09/1946
BR 63672 w/e 05/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O4/813/04/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3697
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 12/06/1924
Withdrawal Thu 05/12/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 12/06/1924
CLK Colwick 16/12/1933
ANN Annesley 10/02/1934
CLK Colwick 20/11/1938
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
FRO Frodingham 02/12/1945
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 25/08/1946
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/12/1961
   Withdrawn 05/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 3w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   05/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1317)
27/08/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1496)
29/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1338)
08/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1049)
28/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1003)
18/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1874)
13/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3392)
19/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
30/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3386)
27/09/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3332)
05/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3318)
28/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22125)
13/04/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28388)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/05/1924 14/06/1924 30 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6354
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1927 27/08/1927 185 days General
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 26/11/1929 46 days General  
Gorton Works 08/08/1931 29/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1933 08/12/1933 58 days General
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1935 28/12/1935 41 days General
Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1937 18/12/1937 19 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1940 13/04/1940 25 days General
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 17/06/1942 19/08/1942 64 days General
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1944 30/12/1944 28 days General
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1947 27/09/1947 49 days General
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1950 05/08/1950 52 days General
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63672
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1953 28/03/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1953 03/04/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/02/1957 13/04/1957 48 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1957 02/05/1957 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/08/1960 24/09/1960 34 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1653
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3697
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2905    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6354
   
12/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/06/1924 To Stock To LNWR stock    
24/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 26/11/1929.    
08/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1933. Dep: 08/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 28/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1942. Dep: 19/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
03/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3672    
10/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
   
15/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63672
   
27/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 03/04/1953.    
25/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 02/05/1957.    
22/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960.    
10/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
05/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63672 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev