Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1091 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2317 Week
» 21962 Month
» 56604 Year
» 1278169 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1654 m/e 10/1917
LNWR 2957 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6352   09/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3673   22/12/1946
BR 63673 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/210/1917
O4/716/03/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3698
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 09/08/1924
Withdrawal Fri 08/05/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 9/5/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
DFU Dunfermline Upper 09/08/1924
THJ Thornton Junction 22/08/1924
GOR Gorton 01/10/1943
WHL West Hartlepool 13/03/1944
NPT Newport (Teeside) 05/10/1944
WHL West Hartlepool 18/10/1944
HLS Hull Springhead 11/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 11/09/1949
HLS Hull Springhead 04/12/1949
53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
84B Oxley (on loan) 02/09/1951
38A Colwick 23/09/1951
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 08/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   21/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1474)
14/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
05/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 857)
10/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1948)
16/03/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3663)
21/03/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3674)
05/02/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3697)
18/05/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3677)
05/06/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3659)
16/12/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22311)
18/10/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22870)
29/05/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22319)
10/12/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22326)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 09/08/1924 171 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6352
 
Cowlairs Works 30/03/1926 05/08/1926 129 days General  
Cowlairs Works 23/04/1928 08/08/1928 108 days General  
Cowlairs Works 07/05/1930 02/07/1930 57 days General  
Cowlairs Works 03/12/1931 20/01/1932 49 days General  
Cowlairs Works 03/02/1932 04/03/1932 31 days Light Repair
To Cowlairs 14/9/33, but sent to Gorton
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1933 14/10/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 05/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 10/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1940 16/03/1940 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1942 21/03/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1944 05/02/1944 17 days General
Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1946 18/05/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 05/06/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63673
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1950 16/12/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1952 18/10/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1952 26/10/1952 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/05/1954 29/05/1954 8 days General
Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1954 09/06/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/06/1954 18/06/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/11/1955 10/12/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22326 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1654
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3698
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2957    
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6352
   
09/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
09/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
30/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1926. Dep: 05/08/1926.    
23/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1928. Dep: 08/08/1928.    
07/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1930. Dep: 02/07/1930.    
03/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1931. Dep: 20/01/1932.    
03/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1932. Dep: 04/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
To Cowlairs 14/9/33, but sent to Gorton
   
30/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
   
04/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D)
   
13/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
05/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
18/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
11/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
27/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3673    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63673
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
25/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to Oxley (84B)    
23/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D)
   
21/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 26/10/1952.    
22/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 09/06/1954.    
16/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954.    
12/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22326 (Diagram 15D)
   
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
08/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63673 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev