|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/02/1924 | 09/08/1924 | 171 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6352 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/03/1926 | 05/08/1926 | 129 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1928 | 08/08/1928 | 108 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1930 | 02/07/1930 | 57 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/12/1931 | 20/01/1932 | 49 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1932 | 04/03/1932 | 31 days | Light Repair | To Cowlairs 14/9/33, but sent to Gorton |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1935 | 05/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1942 | 21/03/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1944 | 05/02/1944 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63673 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1952 | 26/10/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1954 | 29/05/1954 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1954 | 09/06/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22326 (Diagram 15D) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1654 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3698 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2957 | ||
21/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6352 |
||
09/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
09/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
30/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1926. Dep: 05/08/1926. | ||
23/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1928. Dep: 08/08/1928. | ||
07/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1930. Dep: 02/07/1930. | ||
03/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1931. Dep: 20/01/1932. | ||
03/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1932. Dep: 04/03/1932. Work undertaken: To Cowlairs 14/9/33, but sent to Gorton |
||
30/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 857 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D) |
||
04/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D) |
||
13/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
05/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
11/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3673 | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63673 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
25/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to Oxley (84B) | ||
23/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D) |
||
21/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 26/10/1952. | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 09/06/1954. | ||
16/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954. | ||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22326 (Diagram 15D) |
||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
08/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63673 from Mexborough (41F) |