Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 54 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5562 Week
» 26464 Month
» 26464 Year
» 1248029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1655 m/e 10/1917
LNWR 2958 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6351   19/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3674   01/09/1946
BR 63674 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/210/1917
O4/811/05/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3699
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 19/08/1924
Withdrawal Sat 15/01/1966 off Colwick (16B)
Scrapping Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 48 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to George Cohen, Kettering, 3/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
29B Aberdeen Ferryhill 19/08/1924
IMM Immingham 22/07/1943
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
WFD Woodford Halse 18/08/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 15/05/1949
ANN Annesley 18/12/1949
38A Colwick 28/09/1952
38D Staveley (G.C.) 01/02/1953
38A Colwick 26/04/1953
38D Staveley (G.C.) 17/07/1955
38A Colwick 01/01/1956
   Withdrawn 15/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   w/e 15/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1473)
01/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1377)
27/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1475)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
25/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3228)
10/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3298)
09/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3262)
23/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3311)
23/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
30/07/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3409)
05/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22181)
07/11/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22184)
05/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22278)
11/05/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28931)
03/07/1959 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28362)
11/03/1961 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28802)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 19/08/1924 181 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6351
 
Cowlairs Works 23/02/1926 11/06/1926 109 days General  
Cowlairs Works 23/01/1928 27/03/1928 65 days General  
Cowlairs Works 12/03/1930 01/05/1930 51 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1932 01/12/1932 50 days General
New chimney and snifting valve fitted
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1935 27/04/1935 37 days General
Boiler number C1475 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1935 19/09/1935 16 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 26/05/1937 19/06/1937 25 days General
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1937 26/11/1937 30 days General  
Gorton Works 10/05/1939 01/07/1939 53 days General  
Gorton Works 01/01/1941 25/01/1941 25 days General
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1943 10/04/1943 46 days General
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1945 09/06/1945 45 days General
Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1946 23/11/1946 74 days General
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1948 23/04/1948 46 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63674
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1949 30/07/1949 52 days General
Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1951 05/05/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 22181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1952 28/06/1952 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/10/1953 07/11/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 22184 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1955 05/11/1955 31 days General
Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1957 11/05/1957 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1959 03/07/1959 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1961 11/03/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1655
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3699
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2958    
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 19/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6351
   
19/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (29B)    
19/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1926. Dep: 11/06/1926.    
23/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1928. Dep: 27/03/1928.    
12/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1930. Dep: 01/05/1930.    
13/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1932. Dep: 01/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
New chimney and snifting valve fitted
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1475 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1935. Dep: 19/09/1935.    
26/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1937. Dep: 26/11/1937.    
10/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939.    
01/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
26/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3674    
11/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
09/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63674
   
15/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22181 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952.    
28/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
26/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22184 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
06/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 15)
   
04/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63674 from Colwick (16B)    

prev prev