Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1656 m/e 10/1917
LNWR 2906 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6353   03/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3675   03/11/1946
BR 63675 w/e 14/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1917
O4/723/12/1939
O4/802/02/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3700
To Service During 10/1917
Taken into Stock 03/05/1924
Withdrawal Sat 15/01/1966 off Colwick (16B)
Scrapping Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 48 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to George Cohen, Kettering, 3/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 01/05/1924
ANN Annesley 15/05/1924
CLK Colwick 20/11/1938
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
IMM Immingham 09/12/1945
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
STV Staveley (G.C.) 14/07/1946
SHF Sheffield Darnall 07/08/1949
38D Staveley (G.C.) 30/03/1952
38A Colwick 01/01/1956
   Withdrawn 15/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 15/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1170)
23/06/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
24/07/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1350)
25/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1746)
23/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1483)
24/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)
23/12/1939 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3658)
21/03/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3682)
15/04/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3681)
04/05/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3680)
14/08/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3677)
07/04/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22316)
28/11/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22334)
29/10/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22321)
02/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28927)
03/04/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28385)
19/05/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28372)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 03/05/1924 50 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6353
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1926 23/06/1926 92 days General
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1928 24/07/1928 85 days General
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1930 03/10/1930 67 days General  
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 25/03/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1935 23/07/1935 48 days General
Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1937 24/09/1937 30 days General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1939 23/12/1939 37 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1942 21/03/1942 28 days General
Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1944 15/04/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1946 04/05/1946 42 days General
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1948 14/08/1948 51 days General
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63675
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1951 07/04/1951 44 days General
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1953 28/11/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 22334 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1955 29/10/1955 27 days General
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1956 02/02/1957 67 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1957 18/05/1957 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 18/03/1959 03/04/1959 17 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1961 19/05/1961 33 days General
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1656
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3700
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2906    
08/1921 Allocation      
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6353
   
01/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1926. Dep: 23/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
   
01/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1928. Dep: 24/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1930. Dep: 03/10/1930.    
18/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1935. Dep: 23/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1937. Dep: 24/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
   
20/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3675    
25/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63675
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
23/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
03/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22334 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
28/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 02/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957.    
18/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63675 from Colwick (16B)    

prev prev