|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 03/05/1924 | 50 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6353 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1926 | 23/06/1926 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1928 | 24/07/1928 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1930 | 03/10/1930 | 67 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1933 | 25/03/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1935 | 23/07/1935 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1937 | 24/09/1937 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 37 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1942 | 21/03/1942 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1948 | 14/08/1948 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63675 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1951 | 07/04/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22334 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1956 | 02/02/1957 | 67 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1959 | 03/04/1959 | 17 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1961 | 19/05/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1656 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3700 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2906 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6353 |
||
01/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1926. Dep: 23/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1928. Dep: 24/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1930. Dep: 03/10/1930. | ||
18/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1935. Dep: 23/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1937. Dep: 24/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3682 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D) |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3675 | ||
25/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63675 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
23/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
03/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22334 (Diagram 15D) |
||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
28/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 02/02/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. | ||
18/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63675 from Colwick (16B) |