Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 373 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6736 Week
» 9318 Month
» 273951 Year
» 1495516 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1658 m/e 11/1917
LNWR 2908 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6348   26/04/1924
War Dept. 753   05/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3702
To Service During 11/1917
Taken into Stock 26/04/1924
Withdrawal Sun 05/10/1941 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 753 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1917
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 25/04/1924
IMM Immingham 03/05/1924
TUX Tuxford 27/10/1928
IMM Immingham 26/03/1930
   Withdrawn 05/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
08/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1856)
18/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1936)
09/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
31/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
25/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3202)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1255)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 26/04/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6348
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1925 22/08/1925 64 days General  
Gorton Works 07/01/1928 18/02/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 15/02/1930 08/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1932 18/06/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1935 09/02/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1937 31/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1939 25/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1941 27/09/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1658
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3702
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2908    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6348
   
25/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925.    
07/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1928. Dep: 18/02/1928.    
27/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
15/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1936 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 753 from Immingham (IMM)    
05/10/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 753    

prev prev