Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1663 m/e 12/1917
LNER (1924) 6347   29/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3681   31/08/1946
BR 63681 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3707
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 29/03/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/02/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 08/04/1924
DON Doncaster 12/04/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 07/09/1944
ANN Annesley 06/01/1946
CLK Colwick 29/06/1947
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 24/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 29/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 24/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1054)
09/03/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 117)
28/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1119)
12/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
24/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1381)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
17/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3217)
15/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3258)
09/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3311)
18/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3265)
31/08/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3337)
11/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3311)
04/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22128)
19/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22259)
29/05/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22233)
24/11/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22101)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/01/1924 29/03/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6347
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1926 19/06/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 09/03/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1931 28/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1119 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1932 12/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1934 24/11/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1936 31/10/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1938 17/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1941 15/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 13/04/1942 09/05/1942 27 days Heavy
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1943 18/09/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1946 31/08/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3681
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1947 27/09/1947 84 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/03/1948 11/05/1948 43 days Heavy
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63681
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1948 20/11/1948 8 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 27/08/1949 17/09/1949 22 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1950 30/09/1950 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 8 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1954 29/05/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1956 24/11/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22101 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1958 15/02/1958 9 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/02/1960 19/03/1960 29 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 02/04/1960 21/05/1960 50 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/05/1960 11/06/1960 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/02/1962 17/02/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1663
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3707
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6347
   
29/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
08/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926.    
22/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 09/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
   
14/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1119 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
   
24/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
   
03/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3681
   
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947.    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 11/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63681
   
13/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948.    
27/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949.    
16/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950.    
28/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
22/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15)
   
01/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22101 (Diagram 15)
   
07/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1958. Dep: 15/02/1958.    
20/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960.    
02/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960.    
28/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960.    
17/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/02/1962. Dep: 17/02/1962.    
24/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63681 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev