Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1664 m/e 12/1917
LNER (1924) 6548   04/08/1928
LNER (1946) 3682   21/12/1946
BR 63682 w/e 25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/212/1917
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3708
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 04/08/1928
Withdrawal Fri 06/03/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Side doors fitted at Dunfermline Upper shed 4/2/29
Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 03/11/1928
MEX Mexborough 06/10/1943
FRO Frodingham 16/09/1945
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
36B Mexborough 27/08/1950
40E Langwith Junction 10/09/1950
39A Gorton 11/03/1951
39B Sheffield Darnall 08/04/1951
   Withdrawn 06/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 27/08/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 14/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1937)
18/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1942)
14/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1069)
04/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
25/04/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
01/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
21/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
25/06/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3385)
10/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22269)
30/04/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22290)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 04/08/1928 106 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6548
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1928 02/11/1928 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 18/09/1930 25/10/1930 38 days General  
Gorton Works 11/02/1933 18/02/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15)
 
Cowlairs Works 10/07/1933 14/07/1933 5 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 14/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
 
Cowlairs Works 06/05/1936 01/07/1936 57 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 04/11/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1942 25/04/1942 10 days General
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1944 01/07/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1946 21/12/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3682
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1949 25/06/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63682
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1952 10/05/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1952 16/05/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/04/1955 30/04/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1959 02/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1664
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3708
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6548
   
04/08/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
01/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1928. Dep: 02/11/1928.    
03/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
18/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930.    
11/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: 18/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/07/1933. Dep: 14/07/1933.    
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1936. Dep: 01/07/1936.    
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
   
06/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3682
   
04/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63682
   
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
11/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
19/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1952. Dep: 16/05/1952.    
02/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959.    
06/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63682 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev