Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 318 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6681 Week
» 9263 Month
» 273896 Year
» 1495461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1665 m/e 01/1918
LNER (1924) 6549   30/03/1929
War Dept. 700   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3709
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 30/03/1929
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off West Hartlepool (WHL)
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 700 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 11/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1918
YK York (North) 30/03/1929
HLS Hull Springhead 06/02/1930
CUD Cudworth 07/02/1930
WHL West Hartlepool 14/06/1940
   Withdrawn 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1462)
03/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1864)
19/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3215)
14/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3234)
30/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1075)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/12/1928 30/03/1929 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6549
 
Darlington Works 30/06/1931 28/08/1931 60 days General  
Gorton Works 17/02/1934 03/03/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1935 19/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1938 14/01/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1941 30/08/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1665
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3709
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 30/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6549
   
30/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
30/03/1929 To Stock To LNER stock    
06/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
30/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1931. Dep: 28/08/1931.    
17/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15)
   
14/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
16/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 700 from West Hartlepool (WHL)    
20/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 700    

prev prev