Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1666 m/e 01/1918
LNWR 2911 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6345   16/02/1924
War Dept. 731   14/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3710
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 731 and sent to the Middle East via Ellesmere Port, 10/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
IMM Immingham 22/02/1924
MAR March 02/03/1929
DON Doncaster 09/12/1933
   Withdrawn 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 154)
27/10/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1399)
12/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
02/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
27/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
26/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1052)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1249)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/01/1924 16/02/1924 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6345
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1926 19/06/1926 99 days General  
Gorton Works 04/08/1928 27/10/1928 85 days General
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1930 18/10/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 05/11/1932 12/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1935 02/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1937 27/04/1937 18 days General
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1939 26/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 13/09/1941 6 days General
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1666
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3710
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2911    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6345
   
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926.    
04/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930.    
05/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 27/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 731 from Doncaster (DON)    
14/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 731    

prev prev