Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1667 m/e 01/1918
LNWR 2912 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6344   22/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3685   23/11/1946
BR 63685 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3711
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 22/05/1924
Withdrawal Tue 31/03/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 46 yrs , 3 mths

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Killamarsh, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 22/05/1924
CLK Colwick 05/02/1929
LNG Langwith Junction 23/06/1930
CLK Colwick 19/09/1944
ANN Annesley 26/10/1947
CLK Colwick 09/05/1948
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/02/1949
41H Staveley (G.C.) 30/12/1962
   Withdrawn 31/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 05/03/1949
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   31/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1167)
05/02/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 934)
13/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
26/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1013)
08/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3291)
07/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 855)
21/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3291)
22/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
23/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1287)
19/02/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3222)
27/10/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22219)
17/08/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22237)
10/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22883)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/04/1924 22/05/1924 37 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6344
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1927 01/04/1927 45 days General  
Gorton Works 07/12/1928 05/02/1929 61 days General
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 13/03/1931 63 days General
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1933 26/08/1933 40 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1935 17/08/1935 34 days General
Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1937 08/05/1937 38 days General
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1939 07/10/1939 59 days General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1942 21/03/1942 42 days General
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1944 22/01/1944 21 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1945 22/12/1945 14 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/10/1946 23/11/1946 38 days General
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3685
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1949 19/02/1949 47 days General
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63685
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1949 20/05/1949 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/09/1951 27/10/1951 35 days General
Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1951 03/11/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/07/1954 17/08/1954 46 days General
Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1958 10/05/1958 53 days General
Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1958 24/05/1958 10 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1667
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3711
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2912    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/04/1924. Dep: 22/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6344
   
22/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
16/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1927. Dep: 01/04/1927.    
07/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1928. Dep: 05/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 13/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
   
08/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
   
02/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1944. Dep: 22/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945.    
17/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3685
   
26/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
09/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63685
   
27/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
16/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949.    
23/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951.    
03/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1954. Dep: 17/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15)
   
19/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
   
15/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958.    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
31/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63685 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev