Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 712 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4533 Week
» 21869 Month
» 299665 Year
» 1184046 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1668 m/e 02/1918
LNER (1924) 6495   04/07/1925
LNER (1946) 3686   26/05/1946
BR 63686 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3712
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 04/07/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 02/07/1925
DON Doncaster 17/07/1925
NWE New England 08/01/1926
ANN Annesley 25/01/1933
WFD Woodford Halse 07/05/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall 14/03/1946
ANN Annesley 09/05/1948
39A Gorton 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 02/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1325)
05/04/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1139)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1851)
09/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1210)
19/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 655)
28/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3244)
15/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
14/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3229)
09/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3377)
24/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
26/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22261)
25/05/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22278)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 04/07/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6495
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1927 24/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 08/03/1930 05/04/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 10/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1935 09/02/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1936 19/12/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1939 28/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1941 15/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1943 14/08/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1943 25/09/1943 4 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/02/1946 09/03/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1948 24/04/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63686
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1950 25/02/1950 15 days General  
Gorton Works 16/06/1951 28/07/1951 43 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/04/1952 26/04/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22261 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1952 30/08/1952 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/09/1954 30/10/1954 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 04/05/1957 25/05/1957 22 days General
Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1960 30/01/1960 29 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1668
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3712
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6495
   
02/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/07/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.    
08/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15)
   
25/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943.    
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3686    
03/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63686
   
09/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950.    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
16/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1951. Dep: 28/07/1951.    
05/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22261 (Diagram 15)
   
09/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952.    
22/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954.    
04/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15)
   
02/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1960. Dep: 30/01/1960.    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63686 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev