Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 732 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3875 Week
» 14045 Month
» 291841 Year
» 1176222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1669 m/e 02/1918
LNER (1924) 6324   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3687   02/11/1946
BR 63687 w/e 25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O129/12/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3713
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 15/03/1924
Withdrawal Wed 16/10/1963 off March (31B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 30/1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/03/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 26/03/1924
CLK Colwick 21/01/1925
GRA Grantham 16/09/1940
DON Doncaster 21/11/1942
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 12/12/1943
GOR Gorton 06/01/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
ANN Annesley 19/02/1948
GOR Gorton 07/03/1948
38B Annesley 23/04/1950
31B March 10/02/1957
   Withdrawn 16/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   16/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1326)
17/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1328)
27/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1544)
29/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1111)
16/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3221)
14/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3330)
27/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3406)
05/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
29/12/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5032)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
27/12/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5052)
01/04/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5100)
12/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28805)
04/09/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28371)
20/09/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28314)
03/06/1961 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 15/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6324
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1924 17/01/1925 92 days General
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 14/04/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 27/12/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1933 29/07/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1935 16/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1938 14/05/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1940 27/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1943 05/06/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1943 28/08/1943 4 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/06/1944 22/07/1944 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/10/1945 29/12/1945 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Light Repair
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1947 27/12/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1949 25/06/1949 1 day Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 63687
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1950 01/04/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1952 12/04/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1954 04/09/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1955 10/09/1955 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/06/1956 07/07/1956 36 days General  
Gorton Works 23/08/1958 20/09/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1960 09/04/1960 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/04/1961 03/06/1961 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1962 27/01/1962 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 30/07/1962 02/08/1962 4 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1669
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3713
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6324
   
15/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
18/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
25/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928.    
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
   
25/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.    
13/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A)
   
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
06/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3687    
06/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
07/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63687
   
18/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5100 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
29/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955.    
02/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956.    
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28314 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960.    
22/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
13/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1962. Dep: 27/01/1962.    
30/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 02/08/1962.    
16/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63687 from March (31B)    

prev prev