Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1670 m/e 02/1918
LNWR 2913 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6343   08/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3688   15/12/1946
BR (Tmp) E3688   03/02/1948
BR 63688 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O4/802/11/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E104
Works Number 3714
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 08/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 26/09/1965 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 17/03/1924
DON Doncaster 24/03/1924
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 12/12/1943
36A Doncaster 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1496)
30/03/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1465)
23/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1353)
09/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1146)
13/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1262)
13/06/1934 Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
11/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
20/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
02/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
13/01/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
03/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3413)
22/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3350)
17/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
22/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22251)
10/04/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22235)
02/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28923)
06/03/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28358)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/01/1924 08/03/1924 52 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6343
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1926 30/03/1927 103 days General
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1929 23/07/1929 149 days General
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1931 09/10/1931 47 days General
Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1934 13/06/1934 31 days General
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1936 11/07/1936 21 days General
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1938 20/08/1938 50 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1940 02/11/1940 16 days General
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1943 12/06/1943 33 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1944 13/01/1945 35 days General
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1945 01/12/1945 62 days General  
Gorton Works 13/12/1947 03/02/1948 53 days General
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3688
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1948 08/01/1949 31 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 63688
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1949 22/01/1949 12 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1949 17/12/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1952 22/03/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1954 10/04/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1956 02/11/1956 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1959 24/03/1959 23 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 26/01/1962 06/03/1962 40 days General
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1963 26/03/1963 13 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1670
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3714
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2913    
08/1921 Allocation      
17/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/01/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6343
   
08/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 30/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1465 (Diagram 15)
   
25/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1929. Dep: 23/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1934. Dep: 13/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1262 (Diagram 15)
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles
   
21/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
   
11/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
10/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3688    
13/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 03/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3688
   
09/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63688
   
11/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
14/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959.    
26/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1962. Dep: 06/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/03/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1963. Dep: 26/03/1963.    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63688 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev