Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1701 m/e 12/1917
LNER (1924) 6554   25/06/1927
LNER (1946) 3629   05/10/1946
BR 63629 w/e 19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1244
To Service During 12/1917
Taken into Stock 23/06/1927
Withdrawal Tue 10/02/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/2/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 23/06/1927
MEX Mexborough 25/07/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 01/07/1945
   Withdrawn 10/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   10/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
28/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1951)
16/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
30/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3238)
28/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3221)
16/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3412)
23/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3424)
09/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
02/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3240)
19/11/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1245)
26/07/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22278)
28/05/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22275)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 25/06/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6554
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 26/10/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 28/11/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 16/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1936 30/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 28/05/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1940 16/11/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1943 23/01/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1945 09/06/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1947 02/08/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1949 19/11/1949 8 days General
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63629
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1952 26/07/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1955 28/05/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1917 To Service To service as ROD Number 1701
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1244
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6554
   
23/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/06/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929.    
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 23/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
05/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3629    
28/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63629
   
28/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15)
   
23/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63629 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev