|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/03/1927 | 25/06/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6554 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1929 | 26/10/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1931 | 28/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1938 | 28/05/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1940 | 16/11/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1943 | 23/01/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63629 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1952 | 26/07/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1701 Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1244 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6554 |
||
23/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/06/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929. | ||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1951 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
14/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 23/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
12/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
05/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3629 | ||
28/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63629 |
||
28/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63629 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |