Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 77 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2391 Week
» 13684 Month
» 278317 Year
» 1499882 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1712 m/e 02/1918
LNER (1924) 6555   07/05/1927
LNER (1946) 3630   09/11/1946
BR 63630 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O130/06/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1255
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 10/05/1927
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Mon 25/10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 47 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 8/65. Cut up 25/10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1918
DON Doncaster on 10/05/1927
MEX Mexborough on 20/06/1943
GOR Gorton on 08/07/1945
WFD Woodford Halse on 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B Annesley on 26/11/1950
31B March on 03/03/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 24/01/1960
41J Langwith Junction on 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn on 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1009)
27/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
25/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1366)
07/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3222)
05/02/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
11/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3329)
31/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1019)
30/06/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5039)
31/05/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5014)
27/08/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
19/04/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28828)
17/04/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28341)
08/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28339)
18/10/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28975)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. SLS/196203
26/02/1962 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. SLS/196204
09/11/1963 Oswestry Works 3630 being cut up, 3862(6C), 9657(6D), 41209, 80099(6F). Nr. Works: 25T 4 wheel, GWR brake van and 4 wheel ex-Cambrian coach. SLS/196312

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/02/1927 07/05/1927 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6555
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 10/08/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 06/06/1931 27/06/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 25/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 07/12/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1938 05/02/1938 8 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 11/05/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 23/09/1942 31/10/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1945 30/06/1945 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1947 31/05/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1948 14/02/1948 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/06/1948 12/06/1948 1 day Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63630
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1949 02/04/1949 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/07/1949 27/08/1949 29 days General
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1951 10/03/1951 22 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 05/04/1952 19/04/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1953 18/04/1953 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 27/03/1954 17/04/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1955 23/04/1955 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/08/1955 01/10/1955 50 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1956 08/09/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1958 18/01/1958 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/09/1958 18/10/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 28975 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1959 07/03/1959 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/01/1962 10/03/1962 54 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1712
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1255
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6555
   
10/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/05/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929.    
06/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 28307 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3630    
19/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5014 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.    
12/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63630
   
02/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949.    
30/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
17/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951.    
05/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953.    
27/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955.    
13/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
04/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1958. Dep: 18/01/1958.    
20/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28975 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1959. Dep: 07/03/1959.    
24/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
16/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1962. Dep: 10/03/1962.    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63630 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev