Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1713 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 6556   07/07/1928
LNER (1946) 3631   22/11/1946
BR 63631 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O4/805/01/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1256
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 03/07/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 03/07/1928
GOR Gorton 07/02/1943
CLK Colwick 22/04/1945
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 01/02/1948
ANN Annesley 04/12/1949
39A Gorton 16/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1277)
08/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1056)
05/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1219)
13/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1266)
22/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3265)
12/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
23/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3317)
08/03/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
27/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
19/01/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22237)
03/07/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22240)
05/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28925)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/04/1928 07/07/1928 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6556
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1930 05/07/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 01/10/1932 08/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1934 05/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1937 13/03/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1939 22/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1941 12/07/1941 18 days General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1943 23/10/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1947 08/03/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1948 31/07/1948 31 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63631
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1948 13/11/1948 8 days Light Repair
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1949 27/08/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1951 19/01/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1954 03/07/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1956 05/01/1957 43 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28925 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1959 12/12/1959 27 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1713
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1256
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
28/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6556
   
03/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/07/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
31/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930.    
01/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
   
06/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
   
08/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
   
07/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3631    
08/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
01/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63631
   
06/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
13/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
29/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1951. Dep: 19/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28925 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959.    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63631 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev