Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1716 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 6557   05/05/1928
War Dept. 702   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1259
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 08/05/1928
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 702 and sent tothe Middle East via Birkenhead, 12/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 08/05/1928
   Withdrawn 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1319)
16/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1249)
27/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1359)
10/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3285)
24/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1228)
06/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3433)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 10/03/1928 05/05/1928 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6557
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1930 12/07/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 16/07/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1934 27/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1937 10/04/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1939 24/06/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1941 06/09/1941 18 days General
Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1716
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1259
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
10/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6557
   
08/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930.    
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
   
20/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 702 from Doncaster (DON)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 702    

prev prev